Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Left pending in committee