LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
Senate
Committees
Finance
Calendar
TX
Senate Finance Committee
Overview
Committee Members
Legislative Activity
Bills & Legislation
Calendar
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Senate Finance Committee
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
05/07/2025
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
HB3077
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Finance
HJR2
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
HJR7
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Left pending in committee
04/24/2025
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
04/23/2025
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB771
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
SB2345
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Left pending in committee
HB135
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/05/2025 E Sent to the Governor
04/23/2025
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB771
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
SB2345
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Left pending in committee
HB135
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/05/2025 E Sent to the Governor
04/16/2025
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB1211
Introduced
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Left pending in committee
SB1574
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Posting rule suspended
SB2774
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
SB2873
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
SB2900
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
HJR4
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/05/2025 E Filed with the Secretary of State
04/16/2025
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB1211
Introduced
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Left pending in committee
SB1574
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Posting rule suspended
SB2774
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
SB2873
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
SB2900
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
HJR4
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/05/2025 E Filed with the Secretary of State
04/09/2025
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB214
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 S Left pending in committee
SB935
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 S Left pending in committee
SB1030
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
SB1901
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
SB2018
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
SB2020
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 S Left pending in committee
SB2066
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/07/2025 E Sent to the Governor
SB2206
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
04/02/2025
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB868
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
SB1337
Introduced
Last Action: 04/02/2025 S Left pending in committee
SB1371
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
SB1377
Introduced
Last Action: 04/02/2025 S Left pending in committee
SB1426
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/06/2025 E Sent to the Governor
SB1620
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
SB2064
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
SB2065
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/06/2025 E Sent to the Governor
SJR4
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Left pending in committee
03/31/2025
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB22
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
03/19/2025
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB266
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
SB1018
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
SB1415
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/07/2025 E Sent to the Governor
SB1527
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
SB1737
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
SB1738
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/06/2025 E Sent to the Governor
SJR57
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
03/05/2025
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB260
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Senate appoints conferees-reported
SB263
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
SB293
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
SJR18
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/07/2025 E Filed with the Secretary of State
02/27/2025
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB5
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Additional sponsor(s) authorized
SJR3
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S House passage as amended reported
02/14/2025
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
02/13/2025
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB1
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/15/2025 S House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
02/12/2025
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB1
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/15/2025 S House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
02/11/2025
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB1
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/15/2025 S House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
02/10/2025
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB1
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/15/2025 S House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
02/07/2025
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB1
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/15/2025 S House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
02/06/2025
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB1
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/15/2025 S House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
02/05/2025
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB1
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/15/2025 S House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
02/04/2025
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB1
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/15/2025 S House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
02/03/2025
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB1
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/15/2025 S House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
01/30/2025
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB1
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/15/2025 S House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
01/29/2025
Finance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB1
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/15/2025 S House appoints conferees w/inst-reported