LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Committees
S/C on International Relations
Calendar
TX
House S/C on International Relations Committee
Overview
Committee Members
Legislative Activity
Bills & Legislation
Calendar
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
House S/C on International Relations Committee
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/28/2025
S/C on International Relations Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
HB1026
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
SCR37
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
04/28/2025
S/C on International Relations Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
HB1026
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
SCR37
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
04/14/2025
S/C on International Relations Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
HCR108
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HCR127
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
04/14/2025
S/C on International Relations Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
HCR108
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HCR127
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
03/24/2025
S/C on International Relations Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
HB1240
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
HB1353
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Received from the House
HCR76
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HCR90
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Received from the House