LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
Senate
Committees
Border Security
Calendar
TX
Senate Border Security Committee
Overview
Committee Members
Legislative Activity
Bills & Legislation
Calendar
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Senate Border Security Committee
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/15/2025
Border Security Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB2601
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
04/15/2025
Border Security Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB2601
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
04/10/2025
Border Security Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB2199
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
SB2200
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
SB2201
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
SB2949
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Referred to Energy Resources: Apr 29 2025 9:04PM
SB2332
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
04/03/2025
Border Security Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB36
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
SB2202
Introduced
Last Action: 04/03/2025 S Left pending in committee
03/27/2025
Border Security Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SCR39
Introduced
Last Action: 04/10/2025 S Not again placed on intent calendar
03/20/2025
Border Security Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
SB825
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
02/27/2025
Border Security Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details