Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Senate Economic Development Committee Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/23/2025
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 28 2025 4:48PM
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 28 2025 4:54PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Left pending in committee
04/23/2025
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 28 2025 4:48PM
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 28 2025 4:54PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Left pending in committee
04/14/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 28 2025 4:28PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Left pending in committee
04/14/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 28 2025 4:28PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Left pending in committee
04/07/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Higher Education: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Reported engrossed
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Placed on local & uncontested calendar
03/24/2025
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Reported engrossed
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to s/c on International Relations by Speaker: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
03/17/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to s/c on Workforce by Speaker: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/17/2025 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to s/c on Workforce by Speaker: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 03/17/2025 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
03/10/2025
Enrolled
Last Action: 04/23/2025 E Effective on 9/1/25
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: Apr 24 2025 5:02PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: Apr 24 2025 5:02PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to s/c on Workforce by Speaker: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/18/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Mar 18 2025 1:32PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to s/c on International Relations by Speaker: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM