Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

House Energy and Commerce Committee Bills & Legislation

US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB3017

Introduced
4/24/25  
To direct the Assistant Secretary for Planning and Evaluation of the Department of Health and Human Services to conduct an annual study on health care competition and consolidation at the State level.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB3020

Introduced
4/24/25  
To require the Government Accountability Office to evaluate the effects of anticompetitive contracting clauses in contracts between health insurers and health care providers and to determine actions taken by the Federal Trade Commission and the Department of Justice relating to the use of such clauses in such contracts and to assess their ability to effectively enforce the Federal antitrust laws with respect to such use.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB2986

Introduced
4/24/25  
To require the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission to promulgate regulations that accelerate the interconnection of electric generation and storage resources to the transmission system through more efficient and effective interconnection procedures.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB3022

Introduced
4/24/25  
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to repeal the Obamacare ban on provider-owned hospitals, and for other purposes.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB3021

Introduced
4/24/25  
To eliminate the inpatient-only service list.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB3016

Introduced
4/24/25  
To give the Federal Trade Commission authority over certain tax-exempt organizations.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HJR58

Introduced
2/12/25  
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services relating to "Medicare Program; Calendar Year (CY) 2025 Home Health Prospective Payment System (HH PPS) Rate Update; HH Quality Reporting Program Requirements; HH Value-Based Purchasing Expanded Model Requirements; Home Intravenous Immune Globulin (IVIG) Items and Services Rate Update; and Other Medicare Policies".
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HJR66

Introduced
3/3/25  
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Environmental Protection Agency relating to "Air Plan Approval; Ohio; Withdrawal of Technical Amendment".
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HJR61

Introduced
2/25/25  
Refer
2/25/25  
This joint resolution nullifies the Environmental Protection Agency rule titled National Emission Standards for Hazardous Air Pollutants: Rubber Tire Manufacturing (89 Fed. Reg. 94886) and published on November 29, 2024. The rule addresses the decision in Louisiana Environmental Action Network v. EPA (D.C. Cir. 2020) by implementing emissions standards for the rubber processing subcategory of the rubber tire manufacturing industry to ensure all emissions of hazardous air pollutants from sources in the source category are regulated.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HJR44

Introduced
2/12/25  
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Environmental Protection Agency relating to "National Primary Drinking Water Regulations for Lead and Copper: Improvements (LCRI)".
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HJR43

Introduced
2/12/25  
This joint resolution nullifies the Environmental Protection Agency rule titled New Source Performance Standards Review for Volatile Organic Liquid Storage Vessels (Including Petroleum Liquid Storage Vessels) (89 Fed. Reg. 83296) and published on October 15, 2024. Among other elements, the rule modifies the new source performance standards for volatile organic liquid storage vessels under the Clean Air Act for sources constructed, modified, or reconstructed after October 4, 2023.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HJR45

Introduced
2/12/25  
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Environmental Protection Agency relating to "Reconsideration of the Dust-Lead Hazard Standards and Dust-Lead Post-Abatement Clearance Levels".
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HJR46

Introduced
2/12/25  
This joint resolution nullifies the Environmental Protection Agency rule relating to Decabromodiphenyl Ether and Phenol, Isopropylated Phosphate (3:1); Revision to the Regulation of Persistent, Bioaccumulative, and Toxic Chemicals Under the Toxic Substances Control Act (TSCA) (89 Fed. Reg. 91486) and published on November 19, 2024. Among other elements, the rule revised regulations for two of the five persistent, bioaccumulative, and toxic chemicals to address implementation issues and further reduce potential for exposures to such chemicals for humans and the environment (e.g., requiring the use of personal protective equipment during certain activities involving decabromodiphenyl ether). 
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR341

Introduced
4/21/25  
Expressing support for honoring Earth Day, and for other purposes.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HJR33

Introduced
2/4/25  
This joint resolution nullifies the final rule issued by the Federal Communications Commission titled Addressing the Homework Gap Through the E-Rate Program and published on August 20, 2024. The rule permits schools and libraries participating in the Schools and Libraries Universal Service Support program (E-Rate) to purchase discounted Wi-Fi hotspots and associated mobile connectivity service for off-premises use by students, school staff, and library patrons. Under the rule, E-Rate participants must implement acceptable use policies that require hotspots to be used primarily for educational purposes.