Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

House Energy and Commerce Committee Bills & Legislation

US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HJR34

Introduced
2/4/25  
This joint resolution nullifies the Environmental Protection Agency rule titled Trichloroethylene (TCE); Regulation Under the Toxic Substances Control Act (TSCA) (89 Fed. Reg. 102568) and published on December 17, 2024. Among other elements, the rule prohibits the manufacturing, import, processing, and distribution in commerce of trichloroethylene (TCE) for all uses (including consumer uses), and prohibits the industrial and commercial use of TCE.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HJR27

Introduced
1/22/25  
This joint resolution nullifies the Environmental Protection Agency rule titled Trichloroethylene (TCE); Regulation Under the Toxic Substances Control Act (TSCA) (89 Fed. Reg. 102568) and published on December 17, 2024. Among other elements, the rule prohibits the manufacturing, import, processing, and distribution in commerce of trichloroethylene (TCE) for all uses (including consumer uses), and prohibits the industrial and commercial use of TCE.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HJR30

Introduced
1/24/25  
This joint resolution nullifies the Environmental Protection Agency rule titled Phasedown of Hydrofluorocarbons: Management of Certain Hydrofluorocarbons and Substitutes Under the American Innovation and Manufacturing Act of 2020 and published on October 11, 2024. The rule establishes an emission reduction and reclamation program for the management of hydrofluorocarbons, which are greenhouse gases. The rule also establishes alternative Resource Conservation and Recovery Act standards for certain ignitable spent refrigerants being recycled for reuse.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HJR26

Introduced
1/22/25  
This joint resolution nullifies the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) rule titled Greenhouse Gas Emissions Standards for Heavy-Duty Vehicles—Phase 3 and published on April 22, 2024. Heavy-duty vehicles generally include vocational vehicles (such as public utility trucks and school buses) and tractors (such as cabs on tractor-trailer trucks).Among other requirements, the rule phases in standards to reduce greenhouse gas emissions from certain heavy-duty vehicles. The phased-in standards replace previous standards that were established under the EPA's Greenhouse Gas Emissions and Fuel Efficiency Standards for Medium- and Heavy-Duty Engines and Vehicles—Phase 2 rule with more stringent standards.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HJR15

Introduced
1/9/25  
This joint resolution nullifies the final rule titled Energy Conservation Program: Energy Conservation Standards for Commercial Water Heating Equipment, which was submitted by the Department of Energy on October 6, 2023. The rule adopts more stringent energy conservation standards for commercial water heating equipment under the Energy Policy and Conservation Act in order to achieve more energy savings.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HJR18

Introduced
1/13/25  
This joint resolution nullifies the rule titled National Primary Drinking Water Regulations for Lead and Copper: Improvements (LCRI), which was submitted by the Environmental Protection Agency on October 30, 2024. The rule modifies the regulations under the Safe Drinking Water Act to further reduce lead in drinking water, including by directing water systems to replace all lead and certain galvanized service lines under their control within 10 years.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HJR76

Introduced
3/10/25  
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Environmental Protection Agency relating to "Updates to New Chemicals Regulations Under the Toxic Substances Control Act (TSCA)".
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HJR79

Introduced
3/24/25  
This joint resolution nullifies the Environmental Protection Agency final rule titled Review of Final Rule Reclassification of Major Sources as Area Sources Under Section 112 of the Clean Air Act (89 Fed. Reg. 73293) and published on September 10, 2024. Among other elements, the rule requires sources of persistent and bioaccumulative hazardous air pollutants to continue to comply with certain major source emission standards under the Clean Air Act even if the sources reclassify as area sources.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HJR35

Introduced
2/4/25  
Refer
2/4/25  
Engrossed
2/27/25  
Enrolled
3/4/25  
Passed
3/14/25  
Chaptered
3/14/25  
This joint resolution nullifies the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) rule titled Waste Emissions Charge for Petroleum and Natural Gas Systems: Procedures for Facilitating Compliance, Including Netting and Exemptions and published on November 18, 2024. The rule outlines compliance requirements under the Methane Emissions Reduction Program. Under the program, the EPA collects an annual charge on emissions of methane and other greenhouse gases from the oil and gas sector if the emissions exceed specified waste emissions thresholds.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HCR18

Introduced
3/10/25  
Expressing support for the recognition of March 10, 2025, as "Abortion Provider Appreciation Day".
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB305

Introduced
1/9/25  
One School, One Nurse Act of 2025This bill directs the Department of Education (ED) to award competitive grants to eligible entities for recruiting, hiring, and retaining school nurses. An eligible entity is a local educational agency (LEA) or a partnership between a state educational agency and a consortium of LEAs in the state.Further, ED must specify in regulation the recommended nurse-to-student ratios for elementary and secondary schools.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB1

Introduced
1/3/25  
Refer
1/3/25  
Refer
1/3/25  
Travel Mask Mandate Repeal Act of 2025This bill prohibits federal agencies from imposing a mandate related to COVID-19 that requires the use of face masks on conveyances (e.g., planes, trains, and buses) and at transportation hubs.Further, the bill nullifies (1) the emergency order issued by the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) on January 29, 2021, that mandates such use of face masks on public and commercial conveyances and at transportation hubs, and (2) orders and directives of the Transportation Security Administration (TSA) that relate to the CDC order.As background, the CDC and TSA ceased enforcement of the emergency order following an April 18, 2022, court order. Further, the COVID-19 public health emergency expired on May 11, 2023.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB5

Introduced
1/3/25  
Refer
1/3/25  
Refer
3/14/25  
Refer
3/12/25  
Responsible Legislating Act
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB8

Introduced
1/3/25  
No Federal Funds for Political Prosecutions ActThis bill specifies that no funds or property received through equitable sharing by a state or local law enforcement agency with the authority to prosecute a criminal case may be used to investigate or prosecute a current or former President or Vice President, or a candidate for the office of President.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HB9

Introduced
1/3/25  
No Pro-Abortion Task Force ActThis bill prohibits the use of federal funding for the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) Reproductive Healthcare Access Task Force or any successor or substantially similar task force.HHS launched the task force on January 21, 2022, to identify and coordinate departmental activities related to accessing sexual and reproductive health care.