All Bills - Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR113
Introduced
2/7/24
Refer
2/7/24
Engrossed
2/13/24
Passed
2/16/24
Relating to: proclaiming February 2024 to be American Heart Month in Wisconsin.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR114
Introduced
2/7/24
Refer
2/7/24
Engrossed
2/20/24
Refer
2/26/24
Failed
4/15/24
Relating to: honoring the success of Ben Chan on Jeopardy!
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR115
Introduced
2/12/24
Refer
2/12/24
Engrossed
2/15/24
Refer
2/19/24
Failed
4/15/24
Relating to: commemorating the 80th anniversary of D-Day.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR116
Introduced
2/12/24
Refer
2/12/24
Failed
4/15/24
Relating to: proclaiming March 19 to be Wisconsin Celebrating Women in Public Office Day.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR117
Introduced
2/12/24
Refer
2/12/24
Failed
4/15/24
To amend section 5 of article VIII of the constitution; Relating to: accounting and expenditure of state funds and reduction of deficit (first consideration).
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR118
Introduced
2/12/24
Refer
2/12/24
Failed
4/15/24
Relating to: recognizing and commending the National Conference of State Legislatures on its 50th anniversary in 2025.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR119
Introduced
2/12/24
Refer
2/12/24
Failed
4/15/24
Relating to: declaring March 3, 2024, to March 9, 2024, as Women in Construction Week and celebrating the countless contributions of women in construction.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR12
Introduced
3/6/23
Refer
3/6/23
Engrossed
3/14/23
Refer
3/15/23
Passed
3/24/23
Relating to: declaring March 5, 2023, to March 11, 2023, as Women in Construction Week and celebrating the countless contributions of women in construction.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR120
Introduced
2/12/24
Refer
2/12/24
Failed
4/15/24
Relating to: designating April 2024 as Testicular Cancer Awareness Month in Wisconsin.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR121
Introduced
2/14/24
Refer
2/14/24
Failed
4/15/24
Relating to: proclaiming June 7, 2024, as Upper Mississippi River National Wildlife and Fish Refuge Day.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR122
Introduced
2/14/24
Refer
2/14/24
Failed
4/15/24
Relating to: proclaiming March 26, 2024 as Purple Day for epilepsy.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR123
Introduced
2/14/24
Refer
2/14/24
Failed
4/15/24
Relating to: requesting Governor Tony Evers to send aid and resources to the U.S.-Mexico border to assist with immigration efforts.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR124
Introduced
2/16/24
Refer
2/16/24
Failed
4/15/24
Relating to: proclaiming February 4, 2024, as Transit Equity Day.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR125
Introduced
2/16/24
Refer
2/16/24
Failed
4/15/24
Relating to: proclaiming April 26, 2024, as Shared Parenting Day in Wisconsin.
WI
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR126
Introduced
2/16/24
Refer
2/16/24
Engrossed
2/22/24
Refer
2/26/24
Failed
4/15/24
Relating to: reaffirming Wisconsin's commitment to the strengthening and deepening of the sister ties between the State of Wisconsin and Taiwan; reaffirming Wisconsin's support of the Taiwan Relations Act; supporting Taiwan's signing of a Bilateral Trade Agreement with the United States; and continuing support for increasing Taiwan's international profile.