House
|
08/01/2024
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/27/24
|
|
|
House
|
08/01/2024
|
SIGNED INTO LAW 7/29 CHAPTER 17 SLA 24
|
|
|
House
|
07/16/2024
|
MANIFEST ERROR(S)
|
|
|
House
|
07/16/2024
|
9:00 A.M. 7/16/24 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): WRIGHT
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
CONCURRED AM OF (S) Y39 N1
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
TITLE CHANGE: SCR 14
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
CONCUR TAKEN UP
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
VERSION: SCS CSHB 104(RES)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
PASSED Y18 N2
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
RES SCS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 104(RES)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/15 CAL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
RULES TO FIRST SUP CALENDAR 5/14/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
FN2: ZERO(DNR)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
AM: KAWASAKI
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
NR: WIELECHOWSKI, KAUFMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
DP: BISHOP, GIESSEL, CLAMAN, DUNBAR
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
TITLE CHANGE: SCR 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
RES RPT SCS 4DP 2NR 1AM NEW TITLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): MERRICK, SHOWER, STEDMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): BJORKMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
RES
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
VERSION: CSHB 104(RES) AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
TRANSMITTED TO (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
PASSED Y32 N5 E3
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 104(RES) AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): C.JOHNSON, CARPENTER, VANCE, D.JOHNSON, RUFFRIDGE
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/20 CALENDAR
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
AM NO 11 FAILED Y14 N24 E2
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
AM NO 10 FAILED Y4 N34 E2
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
AM NO 9 FAILED Y11 N27 E2
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
AM NO 8 FAILED Y13 N25 E2
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
AM NO 7 FAILED Y13 N25 E2
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
AM NO 6 NOT OFFERED
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
AM NO 5 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
AM NO 4 FAILED Y14 N24 E2
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
AM NO 3 AS AMD ADOPTED Y36 N2 E2
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
AM 2 TO AM 3 ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
AM 1 TO AM 3 WITHDRAWN
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
RESCIND ACTION (ADOPTED) AM 1 TO AM 3 UC
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
AM 1 TO AM 3 ADOPTED Y38 E2
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
RESCIND ACTION (ADOPTED) AM 3 PASSED Y34 N4 E2
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
AM NO 3 ADOPTED Y21 N17 E2
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
AM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
AM NO 1 FAILED Y14 N24 E2
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
RES CS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): TOMASZEWSKI
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
FN1: ZERO(DNR)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
NR: ARMSTRONG, PATKOTAK
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
DP: RAUSCHER, MCCABE, SADDLER, MCKAY
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
RES RPT CS(RES) NEW TITLE 4DP 2NR
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): SUMNER
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): MCKAY
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
RES
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|