House | 05/06/2024 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
House | 05/06/2024 | FN3: ZERO(EED) | ||
House | 05/06/2024 | NR: C.JOHNSON, SUMNER, ALLARD | ||
House | 05/06/2024 | DNP: GRAY, GROH | ||
House | 05/06/2024 | DP: VANCE | ||
House | 05/06/2024 | JUD RPT CS(JUD) NEW TITLE 1DP 2DNP 3NR | ||
House | 05/03/2024 | RETURNED TO JUD COMMITTEE | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | FN4: (EED/FUND CAP) | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | FN3: ZERO(EED) | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | FN2: ZERO(EED) | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | AM: GROH | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | DNP: GRAY | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | DP: C.JOHNSON, CARPENTER, SUMNER, ALLARD, VANCE | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | JUD RPT CS(JUD) NEW TITLE 5DP 1DNP 1AM | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | FN1: (EED) | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | AM: MCKAY, ALLARD | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | NR: RUFFRIDGE | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | DNP: HIMSCHOOT, STORY, MCCORMICK | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | DP: PRAX | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | EDC RPT CS(EDC) NEW TITLE 1DP 3DNP 1NR 2AM | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | FN1: (EED) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | EDC, JUD | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |