House
|
10/16/2023
|
FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 39
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/28/23
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
SIGNED INTO LAW 7/6 CHAPTER 15 SLA 23
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
MANIFEST ERROR(S)
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
2:26 P.M. 6/26/23 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
FN2: (CED)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): MERRICK, GRAY-JACKSON, DUNBAR, CLAMAN, STEDMAN, STEVENS
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
VERSION: CSHB 112(L&C) AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
PASSED Y19 N1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 112(L&C) AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
NR: STEDMAN, WILSON, BISHOP
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
DP: OLSON, KIEHL, MERRICK
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
FIN RPT 3DP 3NR
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
FIN
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
VERSION: CSHB 112(L&C) AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
TRANSMITTED TO (S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y36 N4
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
RECON SAME DAY UC - IN THIRD READING
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
SADDLER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
PASSED Y36 N4
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 112(L&C) AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING Y38 N2
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
AM NO 3 ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
AM NO 2 FAILED Y7 N33
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
AM NO 1 FAILED Y2 N38
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
L&C CS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
NR: STAPP
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
FOSTER
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
DP: TOMASZEWSKI, CRONK, ORTIZ, COULOMBE, GALVIN, HANNAN, JOSEPHSON, D.JOHNSON,
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
FIN RPT CS(L&C) NEW TITLE 9DP 1NR
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): WRIGHT
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
FN1: (CED)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
NR: SADDLER, WRIGHT
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
DP: PRAX, RUFFRIDGE, FIELDS, CARRICK, SUMNER
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
CORRECTED L&C RPT CS(L&C) NEW TITLE 5DP 2NR
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
FN1: (CED)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
NR: SADDLER, WRIGHT
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
DP: PRAX, RUFFRIDGE, FIELDS, CARRICK, SUMNER
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
L&C RPT 5DP 2NR
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
FN1: (CED)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
DP: MINA, RUFFRIDGE, SUMNER, FIELDS, PRAX
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
HSS RPT 5DP
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): MEARS
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
HSS, L&C
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|