House | 05/01/2023 | COSPONSOR(S): SUMNER, RUFFRIDGE, WRIGHT, PRAX, SADDLER, FIELDS | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | FN1: ZERO(ADM) | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | NR: CARRICK, PRAX | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | DP: FIELDS, WRIGHT, SADDLER, RUFFRIDGE, SUMNER | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | L&C RPT 5DP 2NR | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | COSPONSOR(S): MCCABE, VANCE | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | FN1: ZERO(ADM) | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | DP: C.JOHNSON, MCKAY, VANCE, MINA, MCCABE | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | TRA RPT 5DP | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | PRIME SPONSOR CHANGED: COULOMBE REPLACED MCCORMICK | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | COSPONSOR(S): COULOMBE | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | TRA, L&C | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |