Senate | 05/03/2024 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | FIN | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | VERSION: HB 144 AM | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | PASSED Y35 N4 A1 | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 144 AM | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/2 CALENDAR | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | AM NO 4 NOT OFFERED | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | AM NO 3 AS AMD ADOPTED Y25 N15 | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | AM 1 TO AM 3 ADOPTED Y25 N15 | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | AM NO 3 OFFERED | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | AM NO 2 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | AM NO 1 FAILED Y8 N32 | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | MOTION TO WITHDRAW FAILED Y14 N26 | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | AM NO 1 OFFERED | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | HELD IN SECOND READING TO 5/1 CALENDAR | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | READ THE SECOND TIME | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/2024 | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | FN3: (REV) | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | FN2: ZERO(CED) | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | AM: GALVIN, JOSEPHSON | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | NR: STAPP, HANNAN, ORTIZ | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | DP: COULOMBE, CRONK, D.JOHNSON, EDGMON | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | FIN RPT 4DP 3NR 2AM | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER EDC | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | FN1: (REV) | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | AM: STORY | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | DP: HIMSCHOOT, MCKAY, MCCORMICK, PRAX, RUFFRIDGE | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | EDC RPT 5DP 1AM | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | COSPONSOR(S): PRAX | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | EDC | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |