House | 05/01/2024 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | FN2: (CED) | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | FN1: ZERO(DOH) | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | AM: CARRICK, FIELDS | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | NR: WRIGHT, RUFFRIDGE, SADDLER | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | DNP: SUMNER | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | DP: PRAX | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | L&C RPT CS(L&C) 1DP 1DNP 3NR 2AM | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | COSPONSOR(S): WRIGHT, STAPP | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | FIN REPLACED MLV REFERRAL | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | COSPONSOR(S): MCCABE, SHAW, MCKAY, D.JOHNSON, CRONK | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | MLV REFERRAL MOVED TO AFTER L&C | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | MLV, L&C | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |