House | 02/15/2024 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | FN2: (CED) | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | FN1: ZERO(AJS) | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | AM: GRAY, GROH | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | NR: CARPENTER, SUMNER, ALLARD, VANCE | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | JUD RPT CS(JUD) NEW TITLE 4NR 2AM | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | COSPONSOR(S): MINA | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | COSPONSOR(S): GRAY | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | COSPONSOR(S): ARMSTRONG | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | JUD, FIN | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |