House
|
10/16/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/18/23
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
SIGNED INTO LAW 7/20 CHAPTER 18 SLA 23
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
3:10 P.M. 7/11/23 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
VERSION: HB 23
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
PASSED Y19 N- A1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES, SHOWER, KAUFMAN, GIESSEL, OLSON
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
READ THE THIRD TIME HB 23
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/12 CAL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
DP: KAWASAKI, WIELECHOWSKI, BJORKMAN, MERRICK
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
STA RPT 4DP
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
WIELECHOWSKI, TOBIN, KIEHL, DUNBAR, STEVENS
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON, MERRICK, CLAMAN, BISHOP, KAWASAKI,
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
STA
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
VERSION: HB 23
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
TRANSMITTED TO (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS, JOSEPHSON, STUTES, TILTON
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
PASSED Y36 E4
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
READ THE THIRD TIME HB 23
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 3/31/2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
ARMSTRONG, GRAY, GALVIN
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
SUMNER, SHAW, CRONK, D.JOHNSON, MEARS, STORY, TOMASZEWSKI, MCCORMICK,
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): RUFFRIDGE, EDGMON, CARPENTER, FOSTER, PRAX, COULOMBE, ALLARD,
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
DP: STORY, WRIGHT, C.JOHNSON, CARPENTER, ALLARD, SHAW
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
STA RPT 6DP
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): GROH
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): WRIGHT
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): HIMSCHOOT
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
STA
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/23
|
|
|