House
|
05/13/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): VANCE
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
RESCIND ACTION (CONCUR SEN AM) FAILED Y1 N37 E1 A1
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
CONCURRED AM OF (S) Y38 N1 E1
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
CONCUR TAKEN UP Y37 N1 E1 A1
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2024
|
CONCUR READ AND HELD
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2024
|
VERSION: SCS CSHB 238(JUD)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2024
|
TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2024
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2024
|
PASSED Y17 N2 E1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2024
|
READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 238(JUD)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2024
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING Y15 N4 E1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2024
|
JUD SCS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2024
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2024
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
FN1: ZERO(LAW)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
NR: KAUFMAN, TOBIN
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
DP: CLAMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
JUD RPT SCS 1DP 2NR SAME TITLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
JUD
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
VERSION: CSHB 238(JUD)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
TRANSMITTED TO (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): GALVIN, WRIGHT, SCHRAGE, ORTIZ, SADDLER, CRONK, TOMASZEWSKI
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y35 N5
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
RECON SAME DAY PASSED Y38 N2 - IN THIRD READING
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
EASTMAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
PASSED Y36 N4
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 238(JUD)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS, ALLARD
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/20 CALENDAR
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
AM NO 4 FAILED Y3 N36 E1
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
AM NO 3 NOT OFFERED
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
AM NO 2 FAILED Y3 N36 E1
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
AM NO 1 FAILED Y2 N37 E1
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
JUD CS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
FN1: ZERO(LAW)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
DP: GRAY, GROH, SUMNER, CARPENTER, VANCE
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
JUD RPT CS(JUD) 5DP
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): C.JOHNSON
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
JUD WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
JUD
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/24
|
|
|