Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): KIEHL, MYERS, HUGHES, GRAY-JACKSON, MERRICK, BJORKMAN, STEVENS
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
STA, JUD
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
VERSION: HB 265
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
TRANSMITTED TO (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
PASSED Y39 N1
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
READ THE THIRD TIME HB 265
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, ALLARD, GRAY
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING NEXT CALENDAR
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
AM NO 2 FAILED Y6 N34
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN Y25 N15
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 3/11/2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
FN4: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
FN3: ZERO(LAW)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
FN2: ZERO(ADM)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
FN1: ZERO(ADM)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
AM: GRAY
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
DP: C.JOHNSON, CARPENTER, ALLARD, GROH, SUMNER, VANCE
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
JUD RPT 6DP 1AM
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): CARPENTER
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): WRIGHT
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
FN4: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
FN3: ZERO(LAW)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
FN2: ZERO(ADM)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
FN1: ZERO(ADM)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
DP: C.JOHNSON, CARRICK, CARPENTER, ALLARD, STORY, WRIGHT, SHAW
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
STA RPT 7DP
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
STA, JUD
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
PREFILE RELEASED 1/12/24
|
|
|