Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
REFERRED TO RULES
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
AM: KAUFMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
NR: TOBIN, KIEHL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
DP: CLAMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
TITLE CHANGE: SCR 28
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
JUD RPT SCS 1DP 2NR 1AM NEW TITLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
JUD
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
VERSION: CSHB 358(2D JUD)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
TRANSMITTED TO (S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
PASSED Y38 N2
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 358(2D JUD)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS, VANCE, JOSEPHSON
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/9 CALENDAR
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
AM NO 7 FAILED Y16 N24
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
AM NO 6 NOT OFFERED
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
AM NO 5 FAILED Y1 N36 A3
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
AM NO 4 FAILED Y1 N38 A1
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
AM NO 3 FAILED Y1 N38 A1
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
AM NO 2 FAILED Y1 N38 A1
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
AM NO 1 FAILED Y1 N37 A2
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
2D JUD CS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
AM: VANCE
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
DP: GRAY, CARPENTER, ALLARD, SUMNER
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
JUD RPT CS(2D JUD) NEW TITLE 4DP 1AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
RETURNED TO JUD COMMITTEE
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
DP: GRAY, CARPENTER, GROH, SUMNER, ALLARD, VANCE
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
JUD RPT CS(JUD) NEW TITLE 6DP
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
JUD
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|