House | 02/05/2024 | COSPONSOR(S): CARPENTER | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | FN2: (H.JUD/GOV) | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | NR: C.JOHNSON | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | DNP: GRAY, GROH | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | DP: EASTMAN, ALLARD, CARPENTER, VANCE | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | JUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 2DNP 1NR | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | FN1: (GOV) | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | DNP: STORY | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | DP: ALLARD, CARPENTER, WRIGHT, SHAW | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | STA RPT 4DP 1DNP | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | COSPONSOR(S): TOMASZEWSKI | ||
House | 01/27/2023 | COSPONSOR(S): MCCABE | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | STA, JUD | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/23 |