House
|
10/16/2023
|
FN1: (DOT) FROM SB 67
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 39
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/28/23
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
VETOED BY GOVERNOR 8/26/23
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
10:45 A.M. 8/11/23 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): GALVIN
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
CONCURRED AM OF (S) Y38 N2
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
TITLE CHANGE: SCR 7
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
CONCUR TAKEN UP UC
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
CONCUR READ AND HELD
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
VERSION: HB 51 AM S(EFD ADD S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
OLSON, BISHOP, CLAMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): KIEHL, TOBIN, KAWASAKI, WIELECHOWSKI, DUNBAR, GRAY-JACKSON,
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
PASSED Y20 N-
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
READ THE THIRD TIME HB 51 AM S(EFD ADD S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/16 CAL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
TITLE CHANGE: SCR 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y18 N2
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
FN1: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
DP: BJORKMAN, GRAY-JACKSON, DUNBAR
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
L&C RPT 3DP
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
L&C
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
VERSION: HB 51
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
TRANSMITTED TO (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
PASSED Y35 N1 E4
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
READ THE THIRD TIME HB 51
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE, JOSEPHSON
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/1 CALENDAR
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
AM NO 2 FAILED Y1 N37 E2
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
AM NO 1 FAILED Y16 N22 E2
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
TECHNICAL SESSION 2/24 - ON 2/27 CALENDAR
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
HELD TO 2/24 CALENDAR
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
HELD TO 2/22 CALENDAR
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 2/20/2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
FN1: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
DP: FIELDS, SUMNER, SADDLER, PRAX, CARRICK, RUFFRIDGE
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
L&C RPT 6DP
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): RUFFRIDGE
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): MEARS
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
L&C
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|