House
|
10/16/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/26/23
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
SIGNED INTO LAW 5/25 CHAPTER 5 SLA 23
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
10:06 A.M. 5/22/23 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
CONCURRED AM OF (S) Y35 N3 E2
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
CONCUR TAKEN UP UC
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
CONCUR READ AND HELD
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
VERSION: SCS HB 62(FIN)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
PASSED Y18 N- E2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 62(FIN)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): BISHOP, WIELECHOWSKI
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/28 CAL
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
FIN SCS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
FN1: (CED)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
NR: OLSON
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
DP: STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, WILSON, KIEHL, MERRICK, BISHOP
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
FIN RPT SCS(FIN) 6DP 1NR SAME TITLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
CLAMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN, KAWASAKI, TOBIN, KIEHL, DUNBAR, GRAY-JACKSON,
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
FIN
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
VERSION: HB 62
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
TRANSMITTED TO (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
MEARS
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): CRONK, GALVIN, STUTES, JOSEPHSON, CARRICK, GROH, ORTIZ, WRIGHT,
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
PASSED Y35 N1 E4
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
READ THE THIRD TIME HB 62
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 3/20/2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
FN1: (CED)
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
FOSTER, D.JOHNSON, EDGMON
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
DP: STAPP, GALVIN, HANNAN, JOSEPHSON, COULOMBE, TOMASZEWSKI, CRONK, ORTIZ,
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
FIN RPT 11DP
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): MCCORMICK, FOSTER
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): STORY
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER ENE
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): MINA, PATKOTAK
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
FN1: (CED)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
NR: PRAX, MCKAY, RAUSCHER
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
DP: PATKOTAK, WRIGHT, SCHRAGE, CARRICK
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
ENE RPT 4DP 3NR
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): HIMSCHOOT
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): ARMSTRONG
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): HANNAN
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
ENE
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|