House | 05/08/2024 | COSPONSOR(S): D.JOHNSON | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | COSPONSOR(S): TOMASZEWSKI | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | FN1: (DNR) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | NR: MEARS, ARMSTRONG, DIBERT | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | DP: MCCABE, SADDLER, WRIGHT, RAUSCHER, MCKAY | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | RES RPT 5DP 3NR | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | COSPONSOR(S): CRONK | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | RES, FIN | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |