House
|
10/16/2023
|
PERMANENTLY FILED 7/20 LEGIS RESOLVE 7
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
MANIFEST ERROR(S)
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
9:30 A.M. 6/29/23 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
VERSION: HJR 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
PASSED Y19 N- A1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/12 CAL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
FN1: ZERO(H.RES)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
AM: KAWASAKI
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
NR: CLAMAN, WIELECHOWSKI
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
DP: BISHOP, GIESSEL, KAUFMAN, DUNBAR
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
RES RPT 4DP 2NR 1AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
BJORKMAN, BISHOP, STEDMAN, CLAMAN, HUGHES
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): MYERS, KAWASAKI, TOBIN, SHOWER, KAUFMAN, DUNBAR,
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
RES
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
VERSION: HJR 11
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
TRANSMITTED TO (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): C.JOHNSON, GALVIN, ORTIZ, CARPENTER, GROH, TILTON
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
PASSED Y35 N1 E4
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 11
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): MEARS
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
FN1: ZERO(H.RES)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
DP: MEARS, DIBERT, MCCABE, SADDLER, WRIGHT, RAUSCHER, MCKAY
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
RES RPT 7DP
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): D.JOHNSON, RUFFRIDGE, SUMNER
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): MCKAY
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
RES
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|