Senate | 05/01/2024 | RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | READ THE SECOND TIME | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | FN1: ZERO(H.TRA) | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | NR: MYERS, TOBIN, KIEHL | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | DP: KAUFMAN, WILSON | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | TRA RPT 2DP 3NR | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | TRA | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | VERSION: HJR 19 AM | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | PASSED Y32 N8 | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 19 AM | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | HELD TO 3/6 CALENDAR | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/4 CALENDAR | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | AM NO 5 AS AMD FAILED Y17 N22 E1 | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | AM 1 TO AM 5 ADOPTED UC | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | AM NO 5 OFFERED | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | AM NO 4 ADOPTED UC | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | AM NO 3 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | AM NO 2 FAILED Y15 N24 E1 | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | AM 1 TO AM 2 FAILED Y19 N20 E1 | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | AM NO 2 OFFERED | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | AM NO 1 FAILED Y9 N30 E1 | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | READ THE SECOND TIME | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/1/2024 | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | MLV REFERRAL REMOVED | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | FN1: ZERO(H.TRA) | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | NR: MINA | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | DP: STUTES, MCKAY, VANCE, SUMNER, C.JOHNSON, MCCABE | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | TRA RPT 6DP 1NR | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | TRA, MLV | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |