House
|
05/15/2024
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, WRIGHT
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
NOT TAKEN UP - ADJOURNED SINE DIE
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): FIELDS
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
HELD TO 5/15 CALENDAR
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 5/14/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
FN4: ZERO(AJS)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
FN3: (CED)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
NR: STAPP, COULOMBE, CRONK, TOMASZEWSKI, D.JOHNSON
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
DP: GALVIN, HANNAN, JOSEPHSON, ORTIZ, EDGMON, FOSTER
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
FIN RPT 6DP 5NR
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): HANNAN
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): ARMSTRONG
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
JUD REFERRAL REMOVED
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
JUD, FIN
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
VERSION: SB 104
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
TRANSMITTED TO (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
PASSED Y20 N-
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
READ THE THIRD TIME SB 104
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/21 CAL
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
FN3: (CED) (UPDATED FOR 2024)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 2/19/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
FN2: (CED)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
NR: STEDMAN, OLSON, MERRICK
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
DP: HOFFMAN, KIEHL, BISHOP
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
FIN RPT 3DP 3NR
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): BISHOP, KAWASAKI, KIEHL, GRAY-JACKSON
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
FN1: (CED)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
NR: TOBIN, KAUFMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
DP: CLAMAN, GIESSEL, KIEHL
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
JUD RPT 3DP 2NR
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
JUD, FIN
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|