Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
SIGNED INTO LAW 8/5 CHAPTER 23 SLA 23
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
3:45 P.M. 7/20/23 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
MANIFEST ERROR(S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
JOSEPHSON, MCCORMICK, GRAY, TOMASZEWSKI, WRIGHT, MINA
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): HIMSCHOOT, GALVIN, ARMSTRONG, RUFFRIDGE, SCHRAGE, STUTES,
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
VERSION: SB 119
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
PASSED Y40
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
READ THE THIRD TIME SB 119
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2023
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
FN2: ZERO(COR)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
FN1: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
DP: ARMSTRONG, CARPENTER, C.JOHNSON, STORY, WRIGHT, SHAW
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
STA RPT 6DP
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): HANNAN
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
STA
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
VERSION: SB 119
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
TRANSMITTED TO (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
PASSED Y20 N-
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
KAWASAKI
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): KIEHL, TOBIN, KAUFMAN, DUNBAR, OLSON, MERRICK, BJORKMAN, CLAMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
READ THE THIRD TIME SB 119
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/10 CAL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
FN2: ZERO(COR)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
FN1: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
NR: WIELECHOWSKI, MERRICK
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
DP: CLAMAN, BJORKMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
AM: KAWASAKI
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
STA RPT 2DP 2NR 1AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): SHOWER
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
STA
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|