Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/30/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
SIGNED INTO LAW 7/29 CHAPTER 20 SLA 23
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
9:30 A.M. 7/21/23 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
VERSION: CSSB 123(L&C)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
PASSED Y40
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 123(L&C)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
FN1: ZERO(ADM)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
NR: CARRICK
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
DP: FIELDS, WRIGHT, RUFFRIDGE, PRAX, SADDLER, SUMNER
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
L&C RPT 6DP 1NR
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
L&C
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
VERSION: CSSB 123(L&C)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
TRANSMITTED TO (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
PASSED Y20 N-
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 123(L&C)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
L&C CS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
FN1: ZERO(ADM)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
DP: BJORKMAN, BISHOP, DUNBAR, MERRICK
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
L&C RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
FN1: ZERO(ADM)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
DP: KAUFMAN, MYERS, WILSON
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
TRA RPT 3DP
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
TRA, L&C
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|