Senate
|
10/09/2024
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/24/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2024
|
SIGNED INTO LAW 6/26 CHAPTER 6 SLA 24
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
12:45 P.M. 6/24/24 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
MANIFEST ERROR(S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): TOMASZEWSKI, SCHRAGE
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
VERSION: SB 129
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
PASSED Y39 A1
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
READ THE THIRD TIME SB 129
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): MINA
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
FN1: ZERO(DOT)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
DP: MINA, STUTES, MCKAY, VANCE, SUMNER, C.JOHNSON, MCCABE
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
TRA RPT 7DP
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
TRA
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
VERSION: SB 129
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
TRANSMITTED TO (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
PASSED Y19 N- E1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
READ THE THIRD TIME SB 129
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/5 CAL
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 2/2/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
FN1: ZERO(DOT)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
DP: KAUFMAN, MYERS, TOBIN
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
TRA RPT 3DP
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
TRA
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|