Senate | 05/15/2023 | RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE UC | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 138(FIN) | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | NOT TAKEN UP 5/14 - ON 5/15 CAL | ||
Senate | 05/13/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/14 CAL | ||
Senate | 05/13/2023 | FIN CS ADOPTED UC | ||
Senate | 05/13/2023 | READ THE SECOND TIME | ||
Senate | 05/13/2023 | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/23 | ||
Senate | 05/13/2023 | FN2: (GOV) | ||
Senate | 05/13/2023 | AM: WILSON | ||
Senate | 05/13/2023 | NR: MERRICK, BISHOP | ||
Senate | 05/13/2023 | DP: HOFFMAN, OLSON, KIEHL | ||
Senate | 05/13/2023 | FIN RPT CS 3DP 2NR 1AM NEW TITLE | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | FN1: (GOV) | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | NR: MERRICK | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | DP: WIELECHOWSKI, CLAMAN | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | AM: KAWASAKI, BJORKMAN | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | STA RPT CS 2DP 1NR 2AM NEW TITLE | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | STA WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | STA, FIN | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |