House | 05/01/2024 | NR: C.JOHNSON, MCKAY, MINA | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | DNP: STUTES | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | DP: SUMNER, MCCABE | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | TRA RPT 2DP 1DNP 3NR | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | FN1: (DOT) | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | TRA, FIN | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | VERSION: CSSB 141(TRA) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | PASSED Y20 N- | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 141(TRA) | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | COSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/21 CAL | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | TRA CS ADOPTED UC | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | READ THE SECOND TIME | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/19/2024 | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | DP: HOFFMAN, OLSON, KIEHL, BISHOP | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | FIN RPT CS(TRA) 4DP | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | FIN RPT RECD AWAIT TRANSMITTAL NXT | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | COSPONSOR(S): BISHOP | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | NR: WILSON | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | DP: KAUFMAN, MYERS, TOBIN, KIEHL | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | TRA RPT CS 4DP 1NR SAME TITLE | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | TRA, FIN | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |