Senate
|
10/09/2024
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/11/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2024
|
SIGNED INTO LAW 8/13 CHAPTER 27 SLA 24
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/22/2024
|
DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 8/14/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/22/2024
|
10:45 A.M. 7/22/24 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): TOMASZEWSKI, ALLARD, GALVIN, STUTES, JOSEPHSON, RAUSCHER
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
VERSION: CSSB 174(CRA)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
PASSED Y39 A1
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 174(CRA)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): SHAW
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
DP: GRAY, SADDLER, GROH, CARPENTER, SHAW, WRIGHT
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
MLV RPT 6DP
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
MLV
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
VERSION: CSSB 174(CRA)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
TRANSMITTED TO (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
CLAMAN, STEVENS
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN, HUGHES, MYERS, DUNBAR, GRAY-JACKSON, MERRICK, BISHOP,
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
PASSED Y19 N- E1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 174(CRA)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/3 CAL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
CRA CS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
DP: DUNBAR, GRAY-JACKSON, GIESSEL, BJORKMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
CRA RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
CRA WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
CRA
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
PREFILE RELEASED 1/12/24
|
|
|