House
|
05/09/2024
|
REFERRED TO FINANCE
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
FN11: (DPS)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
FN10: (DPS)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
FN9: (AJS)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
FN8: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
FN4: ZERO(LAW)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
FN3: (ADM)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
FN2: (ADM)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
NR: C.JOHNSON, GRAY, GROH, ALLARD
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
DP: CARPENTER, VANCE
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
PENDING TITLE CHANGE HCR
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
JUD RPT HCS(JUD) NEW TITLE 2DP 4NR
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
JUD
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
VERSION: CSSB 28(FIN)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
TRANSMITTED TO (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
PASSED Y18 N1 E1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 28(FIN)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/6 CAL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
FIN CS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
FN7: ZERO(AJS)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
FN6: (DPS)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
FN5: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
FN4: ZERO(LAW)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
FN3: (ADM)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
FN2: (ADM)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
NR: WILSON, KIEHL, MERRICK, BISHOP
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
DP: OLSON
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
FIN RPT CS 1DP 4NR SAME TITLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
FIN REFERRAL ADDED
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
FN7: ZERO(AJS)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
FN6: (DPS)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
FN5: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
FN4: ZERO(LAW)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
FN3: (ADM)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
FN2: (ADM)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
NR: TOBIN
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
DP: CLAMAN, GIESSEL, KAUFMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
JUD RPT CS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
FN1: ZERO(LAW)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
AM: CLAMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
DP: WIELECHOWSKI
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
NR: KAWASAKI, MERRICK, BJORKMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
STA RPT 1DP 3NR 1AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
STA, JUD
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/23
|
|
|