House | 05/15/2024 | NOT TAKEN UP - ADJOURNED SINE DIE | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR | ||
House | 05/14/2024 | HELD TO 5/15 CALENDAR | ||
House | 05/14/2024 | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2024 | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | FN10: ZERO(DPS) | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | FN9: ZERO(LAW) | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | FN8: ZERO(COR) | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | FN7: ZERO(ADM) | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | FN6: ZERO(ADM) | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | NR: SADDLER | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | DP: PRAX, RUFFRIDGE, CARRICK, SUMNER | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | L&C RPT HCS(L&C) 4DP 1NR | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | L&C | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | VERSION: SB 37 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | PASSED Y20 N- | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 37 | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/8 CAL | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | READ THE SECOND TIME | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/23 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | FN5: ZERO(DPS) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | FN4: ZERO(LAW) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | FN3: ZERO(COR) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | FN2: ZERO(ADM) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | FN1: ZERO(ADM) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | NR: TOBIN, KAUFMAN, KIEHL | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | DP: CLAMAN | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | JUD RPT 1DP 3NR | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | JUD | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/13/23 |