House
|
10/16/2023
|
FN9: (DNR)
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
FN7: (CED)
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 39
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/28/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/24/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
SIGNED INTO LAW 5/23 CHAPTER 2 SLA 23
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
FN11: (DNR)
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
FN10: (DNR)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
5:16 P.M. 5/17/23 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
MANIFEST ERROR(S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
VERSION: CSSB 48(FIN)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 N2
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
RECON SAME DAY UC - IN THIRD READING
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
SADDLER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
PASSED Y38 N2
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 48(FIN)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING Y39 N1
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
FN9: (DNR)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
FN8: INDETERMINATE(CED)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
FN7: (CED)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
NR: ORTIZ, HANNAN, JOSEPHSON
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
DP: TOMASZEWSKI, CRONK, COULOMBE, STAPP, GALVIN, EDGMON, D.JOHNSON, FOSTER
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
FIN RPT 8DP 3NR
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
FIN
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
VERSION: CSSB 48(FIN)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
TRANSMITTED TO (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
RECON SAME DAY UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
GIESSEL NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
PASSED Y20 N-
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
AM NO 1 FAILED Y4 N16
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 48(FIN)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
NOT TAKEN UP 5/14 - ON 5/15 CAL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/14 CAL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
FIN CS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
FN7: (CED)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
FN6: (DNR)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
FN5: (DNR)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
FN4: (DNR)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
NR: WILSON, KIEHL, MERRICK
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
DP: HOFFMAN, OLSON, BISHOP
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
FIN RPT CS 3DP 3NR NEW TITLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
FN6: (DNR)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
FN5: (DNR)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
FN4: (DNR)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
NR: KAWASAKI, DUNBAR
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
AM: BISHOP, CLAMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, KAUFMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
DP: GIESSEL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
RES RPT CS 1DP 2NR 4AM NEW TITLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
FN3: (DNR)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
FN2: (DNR)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
FN1: (DNR)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
RES, FIN
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|