Senate
|
10/09/2024
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SEE CHAPTER
|
|
|
House
|
09/03/2024
|
FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 268
|
|
|
House
|
09/03/2024
|
LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/30/24
|
|
|
House
|
09/03/2024
|
FN4: (DEC)
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/22/2024
|
LAW W/O GOV SIGNATURE 7/22 CH 14 SLA 24
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2024
|
1:50 P.M. 6/28/24 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
MANIFEST ERROR(S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
VERSION: HCS CSSB 67(FIN)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, STORY, SCHRAGE
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
PASSED Y38 N1 A1
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 67(FIN)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
FIN HCS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): FIELDS
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
HELD TO 5/15 CALENDAR
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 5/14/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
FN3: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
DP: TOMASZEWSKI, CRONK, ORTIZ, COULOMBE, HANNAN, GALVIN, STAPP, EDGMON, FOSTER
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 9DP
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): GALVIN, HANNAN
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
FN1: (DOT) INCORPORATED INTO HB 51
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 39
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/28/23
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
FIN
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
VERSION: CSSB 67(RES)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
TRANSMITTED TO (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
PASSED Y20 N-
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 67(RES)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/8 CAL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
RES CS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
FN2: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
FN1: (DOT)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
NR: MERRICK
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
DP: OLSON, KIEHL, BISHOP
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
FIN RPT CS(RES) 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
FN2: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
FN1: (DOT)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
AM: KAWASAKI
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
DP: GIESSEL, BISHOP, CLAMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, DUNBAR, KAUFMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
RES RPT CS 6DP 1AM SAME TITLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON, DUNBAR, GIESSEL, CLAMAN, KAWASAKI, TOBIN, STEVENS
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
RES, FIN
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|