House | 05/11/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
House | 05/11/2024 | RLS | ||
House | 05/11/2024 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | ||
Senate | 05/10/2024 | VERSION: CSSB 85(FIN) | ||
Senate | 05/10/2024 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | ||
Senate | 05/10/2024 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | ||
Senate | 05/10/2024 | PASSED Y19 N- E1 | ||
Senate | 05/10/2024 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 85(FIN) | ||
Senate | 05/10/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC | ||
Senate | 05/10/2024 | FIN CS ADOPTED UC | ||
Senate | 05/10/2024 | READ THE SECOND TIME | ||
Senate | 05/10/2024 | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2024 | FN2: ZERO(REV) | ||
Senate | 04/26/2024 | NR: STEDMAN, OLSON, WILSON, MERRICK, BISHOP | ||
Senate | 04/26/2024 | DP: HOFFMAN, KIEHL | ||
Senate | 04/26/2024 | FIN RPT CS 2DP 5NR NEW TITLE | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | FN1: ZERO(REV) | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | DP: BJORKMAN, DUNBAR, GRAY-JACKSON | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | L&C RPT CS 3DP NEW TITLE | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | FN1: ZERO(REV) | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | L&C, FIN | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |