House
|
05/14/2024
|
VERSION: HCS CSSB 89(L&C) AM H
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, MINA
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y32 N8
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
RECON SAME DAY UC - IN THIRD READING
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
C.JOHNSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
PASSED Y32 N8
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 89(L&C) AM H
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING SAME DAY Y36 N3 A1
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y30 N10
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
TITLE CHANGE: HCR 18
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
L&C HCS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2024
|
FIN REFERRAL REMOVED
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
FN16: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
FN15: ZERO(LAW)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
FN14: ZERO(AJS)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
FN13: ZERO(DOH)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
FN12: ZERO(CED)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
FN11: ZERO(ADM)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
FN10: ZERO(ADM)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
AM: WRIGHT
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
NR: SADDLER, RUFFRIDGE, SUMNER
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
DP: CARRICK, FIELDS, PRAX
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
PENDING TITLE CHANGE HCR
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
L&C RPT HCS(L&C) NEW TITLE 3DP 3NR 1AM
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
L&C, FIN
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
VERSION: CSSB 89(FIN)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
TRANSMITTED TO (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
PASSED Y14 N6
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
HELD IN THIRD READING TO 5/16 CAL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
AM NO 2 FAILED Y5 N15
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
AM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N15
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMDS UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 89(FIN)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2023
|
NOT TAKEN UP 5/14 - ON 5/15 CAL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/14 CAL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
FIN CS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
FN9: ZERO(AJS)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
FN8: (REV)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
FN7: ZERO(LAW)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
FN6: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
FN4: ZERO(DOH)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
FN3: ZERO(ADM)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
FN2: ZERO(ADM)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
FN1: ZERO(CED)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
AM: WILSON
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
NR: STEDMAN, MERRICK
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
DP: OLSON, KIEHL, BISHOP
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2023
|
FIN RPT CS 3DP 2NR 1AM NEW TITLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
FN7: ZERO(LAW)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
FN6: ZERO(DPS)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
FN5: (REV)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
FN4: ZERO(DOH)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
FN3: ZERO(ADM)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
FN2: ZERO(ADM)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
FN1: ZERO(CED)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
DP: BJORKMAN, DUNBAR, BISHOP, GRAY-JACKSON
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
L&C RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, GRAY-JACKSON, KIEHL, TOBIN
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
L&C, FIN
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|