Senate | 05/05/2023 | COSPONSOR(S): MERRICK | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | FN1: (CED) | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | NR: MERRICK | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | DP: BJORKMAN, GRAY-JACKSON, BISHOP, DUNBAR | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | L&C RPT CS 4DP 1NR NEW TITLE | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | COSPONSOR(S): DUNBAR, TOBIN | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | COSPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | L&C, FIN | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |