Senate | 04/14/2025 | REFERRED TO COMMUNITY & REGIONAL AFFAIRS | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | CRA, L&C | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | VERSION: HB 50 | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | PASSED Y35 N2 E3 | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 50 | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/11 CALENDAR | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | READ THE SECOND TIME | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | FN1: ZERO(REV) | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | L&C RPT RECD AWAIT TRANSMITTAL NXT | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | CRA RPT RECD AWAIT TRANSMITTAL NXT |