Senate | 03/14/2025 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | FN1: (EED) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | NR: BJORKMAN, KIEHL | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | EDC RPT RECD W/CS AWAIT TRANSMITTAL NXT | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | COSPONSOR(S): YUNDT, KAUFMAN, CRONK | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | COSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, STEVENS | ||
Senate | 01/22/2025 | COSPONSOR(S): DUNBAR, TOBIN, KAWASAKI | ||
Senate | 01/22/2025 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION | ||
Senate | 01/22/2025 | EDC, FIN | ||
Senate | 01/22/2025 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | ||
Senate | 01/10/2025 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/25 |