House | 03/29/2022 | Delivered to Governor at 3:34 p.m. on March 29, 2022. | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Assigned Act No. 2022-206. | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Clerk of the House Certification | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Signature Requested | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Enrolled | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Passed Second House | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 665 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Third Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Engrossed | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 330 | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 329 | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Allen Amendment Offered | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Allen motion to Table adopted Roll Call 328 | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Agriculture and Forestry Amendment Offered | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |