House | 04/07/2022 | Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April 7, 2022. | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Assigned Act No. 2022-348. | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Clerk of the House Certification | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Signature Requested | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Enrolled | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Passed Second House | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1029 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Third Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 399 | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |