House | 04/07/2022 | Forwarded to Governor on April 7, 2022 at 10:45 a.m. on April 7, 2022. | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Assigned Act No. 2022-433. | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Clerk of the House Certification | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Signature Requested | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Passed Second House | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1044 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Third Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Third Reading Open | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | McClendon motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Third Reading Carried Over | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 207 | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |