House | 03/30/2022 | Forwarded to Secretary of State on March 30, 2022 at 4:40 p.m. on March 30, 2022. | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Assigned Act No. 2022-188. | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Clerk of the House Certification | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Signature Requested | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Passed Second House | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Chambliss motion to adopt Local Application Resolution adopted Roll Call 789 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 788 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Third Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Motion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 563 | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 562 | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |