House
|
04/07/2022
|
Forwarded to Secretary of State on April 7, 2022 at 5:37 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Clerk of the House Certification
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Assigned Act No. 2022-286.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Signature Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Concurred in Second House Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Sorrells motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 969
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Concurrence Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1011
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Livingston motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1010
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Third Reading Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 696
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 695
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Sorrells Amendment Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Urban and Rural Development
|
|
|