1 HJR199 2 216658-4 3 By Representatives Rafferty, England, Hollis, Lawrence, 4 Daniels, Gray, Garrett, Farley, Shedd, Lee, Bracy, Alexander, 5 Lovvorn, Sorrells, Bedsole, Wilcox, Coleman, Morris, 6 Easterbrook, Rogers, Moore (M), Lipscomb, Oliver and Paschal 7 RFD: Rules 8 First Read: 29-MAR-22 Page 0 1 216658-4:n:03/17/2022:SLU/cr LSA2022-130R2 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 CREATING THE INFRASTRUCTURE INVESTMENT STUDY 9 COMMISSION. 10 11 WHEREAS, the federal Infrastructure Investment and 12 Jobs Act (Public Law No. 117-58) was signed into law on 13 November 15, 2021, providing significant federal investment in 14 the nation's infrastructure; and 15 WHEREAS, on January 27, 2021, the President of the 16 United States signed Executive Order 14008 creating the 17 Justice40 Initiative, which aims to deliver 40 percent of the 18 overall benefits of relevant federal investments to 19 disadvantaged communities; and 20 WHEREAS, many disadvantaged communities across 21 Alabama need significant improvements in the areas of public 22 transit, broadband access, water systems, and climate 23 resilience; this commission would help ensure that federal 24 investments are equitably distributed; and 25 WHEREAS, the aforementioned federal investments 26 could help provide, among other things, improved sanitation 27 systems and drinking water, more reliable and affordable Page 1 1 high-speed Internet access, and cleaner and safer 2 transportation systems to these disadvantaged communities; and 3 WHEREAS, the formation of a commission tasked with 4 identifying and communicating with disadvantaged and under 5 resourced communities would help ensure that these communities 6 derive benefit from the federal investments; now therefore, 7 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF ALABAMA, BOTH 8 HOUSES THEREOF CONCURRING, That there is created the 9 Infrastructure Investment Study Commission. 10 (a) The commission shall study and shall make 11 recommendations for infrastructure projects in disadvantaged 12 and under resourced communities in the state. For the purposes 13 of this resolution, "infrastructure" means all of the sectors 14 included in the Infrastructure Investment and Jobs Act, 15 including transportation, water, energy, broadband, and the 16 resilience and rehabilitation of the nation's natural 17 resources. For the purposes of this resolution, "disadvantaged 18 communities" means either a group of individuals living in 19 geographic proximity to one another, or a geographically 20 dispersed set of individuals, such as migrant workers or 21 Native Americans, where either type of group experiences 22 common conditions, and where such a group experiences, or is 23 characterized by, one or more of the conditions set out under 24 the "disadvantaged" description on pages 2 and 3 of the July 25 20, 2021, Interim Implementation Guidance for the Justice40 26 Initiative Memorandum (M-21-28) issued by the Executive Office 27 of the President, Office of Management and Budget. For Page 2 1 purposes of this resolution, "infrastructure projects" means 2 infrastructure improvements funded by monies available due to 3 the Infrastructure Investment and Jobs Act. The study 4 commission shall do all of the following: 5 (1) Identify disadvantaged and under resourced 6 communities throughout the state that could benefit from 7 infrastructure projects. 8 (2) Identify specific infrastructure deficiencies in 9 these disadvantaged and under resourced communities. 10 (3) Identify areas of assistance, as well as 11 agencies, community partners, and academic institutions that 12 will be able to provide assistance that disadvantaged and 13 under resourced communities may need to: 14 a. Apply for and secure funding for infrastructure 15 projects. 16 b. Manage and satisfy reporting obligations 17 associated with any infrastructure projects. 18 (4) Recommend infrastructure projects in its report 19 based upon its study that reflects input from disadvantaged 20 and under resourced communities and includes any 21 recommendations for eliminating procedural hurdles that 22 prevent the communities from applying for and securing the 23 associated funding. 24 (5) Identify current programs and agencies through 25 which infrastructure dollars could be administered and 26 distributed for and to the identified disadvantaged and under 27 resourced communities. Page 3 1 (b) The commission shall be comprised of the 2 following members: 3 (1) One member of the House of Representatives 4 appointed by the Speaker of the House of Representatives. 5 (2) One member of the House of Representatives 6 appointed by the Minority Leader of the House of 7 Representatives. 8 (3) One member of the Senate appointed by the 9 President Pro Tempore of the Senate. 10 (4) One member of the Senate appointed by the 11 Minority Leader of the Senate. 12 (5) The Director of the Alabama Department of 13 Environmental Management, or his or her designee. 14 (6) The Director of the Alabama Department of 15 Transportation, or his or her designee. 16 (7) The State Health Officer of the Alabama 17 Department of Public Health, or his or her designee. 18 (8) The Director of the Alabama Department of 19 Economic and Community Affairs, or his or her designee. 20 (9) The Director of the Alabama Department of 21 Finance, or his or her designee. 22 (10) One member of the Alabama Onsite Wastewater 23 Board. 24 (11) Two civic leaders from disadvantaged and under 25 resourced communities appointed by the Governor. 26 (12) The Director of the Alabama Department of 27 Conservation and Natural Resources, or his or her designee. Page 4 1 (c) The appointing authorities shall coordinate 2 their appointments to assure the commission membership is 3 inclusive and reflects the racial, gender, geographic, urban, 4 rural, and economic diversity of the state. 5 (d) The chair and the vice chair of the commission 6 shall be elected at the first meeting of the commission, which 7 shall be called by the Speaker of the House of Representatives 8 no later than 30 days following the effective date of this 9 act. The commission shall thereafter meet at the call of the 10 chair, or on a motion of a majority of its members. 11 (e) The Legislature shall provide appropriate 12 staffing for the commission. 13 (f) The commission shall provide a preliminary 14 report to the Legislature and the Governor on or before 15 December 31, 2022, and a final report of its findings, 16 conclusions, and recommendations to the Legislature and the 17 Governor on or before December 31, 2023, at which time the 18 commission shall be dissolved. 19 (g) The legislative members of the commission shall 20 be entitled to their legislative compensation, per diem, and 21 travel expenses for each day that they attend a meeting of the 22 commission, in accordance with Amendment 871 of the 23 Constitution of Alabama of 1901. 24 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED, That copies of this 25 resolution shall be delivered to the President of the United 26 States and the Alabama Congressional Delegation. Page 5