Senate | 03/02/2022 | Assigned Act No. 2022-114. | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Signature Requested | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Passed Second House | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 418 | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Third Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 174 | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Chesteen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 173 | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Governmental Affairs first Substitute Offered | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |