Senate | 03/01/2022 | Assigned Act No. 2022-92. | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Signature Requested | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Enrolled | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Butler motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 440 | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Concurrence Requested | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 308 | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 307 | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Military and Veterans Affairs Amendment Offered | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Third Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 248 | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |