Senate | 03/03/2022 | Assigned Act No. 2022-80. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Enrolled | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Signature Requested | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Passed Second House | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 472 | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Third Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 159 | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Melson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 158 | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Education Policy first Substitute Offered | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy |